LA HB402 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the state Dept. of Education and the Dept. of Health and Hospitals to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions
Title
Authorizes the state Dept. of Education and the Dept. of Health and Hospitals to survey students regarding certain risk behavior associated with chronic health conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 402 FINAL PASSAGE (#594) (Y: 53 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-27 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (7-4). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |