LA HB402 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds requirements for eligibility for the income tax credit for taxes paid in other states (EN +$34,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Adds requirements for eligibility for the income tax credit for taxes paid in other states (EN +$34,000,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 402 ADOPT (#1132) (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 402 PREVIOUS QUESTION ENTIRE SUBJ MATTER (#1131) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 402 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1128) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 402 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1011) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 402 FINAL PASSAGE (#837) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 402 FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 96 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 402 PREVIOUS QUESTION ENTIRE SUBJ MATTER (#1131) (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 402 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1128) (Y: 84 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 402 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1011) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 402 FINAL PASSAGE (#837) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 402 FINAL PASSAGE (#248) (Y: 96 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2015-06-19 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 109. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2015-06-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 5 nays. |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 84, nays 12. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2015-06-11 | House | Rules suspended. |
2015-06-11 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2015-06-10 | House | House conferees appointed: Stokes, Robideaux, and Ivey. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2015-06-09 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Adley, and Claitor. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2015-06-09 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-06-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-06-07 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015. |
2015-06-07 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 7. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2015-05-07 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2015-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015. |
2015-05-05 | House | Notice given. |
2015-05-05 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2015-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015. |
2015-04-29 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |