LA HB40 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 06/10/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 06/10/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the board of trustees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN +$21,235 FC SG EX)
Title
Provides relative to the board of trustees of the Firefighters' Retirement System (EN +$21,235 FC SG EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 40 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1454) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#279) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#756) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#279) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Effective date: 06/10/2024. |
2024-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 537. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (8-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024. |
2024-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |