LA HB40 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the governing authority of Assumption Parish to levy a parking and use tax within recreational vehicle parks (EG +$100,000 LF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the governing authority of Assumption Parish to levy a parking and use tax within recreational vehicle parks (EG +$100,000 LF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 40 FINAL PASSAGE (#330) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-08HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2019.
2019-03-04HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
2019-03-04HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback