LA HB4 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extends the date for eligible expenses to qualify for the tax credit for the rehabilitation of historic structures and extends the effectiveness of the credit (Item #19) (EGF SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the date for eligible expenses to qualify for the tax credit for the rehabilitation of historic structures and extends the effectiveness of the credit (Item #19) (EGF SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 4 MOTION TO ADOPT (#181) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 4 ADOPT (#178) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote on HB 4 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#131) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 4 CO-AUTHORS (#93) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 4 FINAL PASSAGE (#92) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 4 FINAL PASSAGE (#9) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20.
2020-06-29HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-28SenateNotice of change in House Conference Committee membership.
2020-06-28HouseNotice of change in House conferees: Magee,Echols, Hughes.
2020-06-28HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-25SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Ward, and Allain.
2020-06-25SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-25SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-25HouseHouse conferees appointed: Magee, Bishop, and Hughes.
2020-06-25HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-24HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/25/20.
2020-06-24HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-23SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-22SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-19SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-18SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2020-06-08HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-05HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/08/20.
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-05HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-05HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-05-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-05-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB4&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177925
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180010
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185131
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180520
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182847
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181962
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182838
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183568
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183537
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183520
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184061
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184102
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177927
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1179942
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180344
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180670
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182878
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184958
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180583
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183640
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183643
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185122
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185181

Bill Comments

feedback