LA HB4 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides that the right to keep and bear arms includes the right to carry a concealed handgun without a permit or license (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides that the right to keep and bear arms includes the right to carry a concealed handgun without a permit or license (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13HouseInvoluntarily deferred in committee.
2016-03-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-01-29HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/15/2016.
2016-12-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2016-12-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback