LA HB399 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Becomes HB 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Becomes HB 679.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to suspension or extension of prescription, peremption, and certain legal deadlines
Title
Provides relative to suspension or extension of prescription, peremption, and certain legal deadlines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Becomes HB 679. |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported by substitute (7-0-1). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |