LA HB399 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the offices of state examiner and deputy state examiner of the municipal fire and police civil service
Title
Provides relative to the offices of state examiner and deputy state examiner of the municipal fire and police civil service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 399 ADOPT (#1023) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 399 MOTION TO ADOPT (#910) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 399 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#746) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 399 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 399 FINAL PASSAGE (#403) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 399 MOTION TO ADOPT (#910) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 399 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#746) (Y: 74 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 399 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 399 FINAL PASSAGE (#403) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 313. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-05 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Johns, Dorsey-Colomb, and Appel. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Danahay, Girod Jackson, and Greene. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 74, nays 22, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-02 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on June 3, 2013. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |