LA HB399 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the election districts for the election of members to the Public Service Commission
Title
Provides relative to the election districts for the election of members to the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB399 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=741196 |