LA HB398 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Ascension, Assumption, and St. James parishes to alter the bail percentage amounts for deposit
Title
Authorizes Ascension, Assumption, and St. James parishes to alter the bail percentage amounts for deposit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-28 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB398 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=776340 |