LA HB397 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to topical ophthalmic prescription refills
Title
Provides relative to topical ophthalmic prescription refills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 397 FINAL PASSAGE (#73) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-04-28 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/28/2015. |
2015-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |