LA HB397 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that bail shall be set within 72 hours of arrest
Title
Provides that bail shall be set within 72 hours of arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 397, FINAL PASSAGE (#380) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | |
2012-04-16 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-16 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/16/2012. | |
2012-04-05 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-04 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-28 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled. |