LA HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to bank operating subsidiaries

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to bank operating subsidiaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#343) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-05-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-15HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-05-14SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-13SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-09SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-08SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-04-30SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-29HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/29/19.
2019-04-24HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-23HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB396&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121452
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126515
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128642
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134254
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125782
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126486
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126791
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121471
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1126744
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128761
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134040

Bill Comments

feedback