LA HB396 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 51. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increases individual sewage fees imposed by the office of public health (EG +$537,850 SG RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases individual sewage fees imposed by the office of public health (EG +$537,850 SG RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 42 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 42, nays 51. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
2018-04-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-04-03HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-04-03HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-03-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/03/18.
2018-03-28HouseNotice given.
2018-03-28HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported favorably (7-2).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback