LA HB396 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 06/22/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the effectiveness and applicability of the state sales and use tax exclusion for sales of gold, silver, or numismatic coins, and platinum, gold, or silver bullion (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the effectiveness and applicability of the state sales and use tax exclusion for sales of gold, silver, or numismatic coins, and platinum, gold, or silver bullion (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 396 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#835) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#737) (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Vote on HB 396 FINAL PASSAGE (#452) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseEffective date: 06/22/17.
2017-06-22HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
2017-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-06HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2017-06-05HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17.
2017-06-04HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-06-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-06-01SenateRules suspended.
2017-06-01SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2017-05-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2017-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-24HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-24HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17.
2017-05-22HouseNotice given.
2017-05-22HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/17.
2017-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-15HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB396&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030644
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041820
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045018
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049647
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1052204
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041465
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041075
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041854
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043355
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046228
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047340
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048516
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049452
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030648
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1033102
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041819
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042344
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045040
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045349
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047185
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050070
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1055784
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045004
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047866

Bill Comments

feedback