LA HB395 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the expenditure or allocation of funds appropriated to postsecondary education management boards
Title
Provides relative to the expenditure or allocation of funds appropriated to postsecondary education management boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 395, AMENDMENT # 361 BY CARMODY, MOTION TO ADOPT (#887) (Y: 15 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-15 | Called from the calendar. | |
2012-05-08 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Notice given. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-04-30 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2012. | |
2012-04-30 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-26 | Reported with amendments (9-6) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-28 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled. |