LA HB394 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-10-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Post-Conviction Veterans Mentor Program (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes the Post-Conviction Veterans Mentor Program (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 394 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#846) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 394 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 394 FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 394 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 394 FINAL PASSAGE (#316) (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 273. |
2018-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/09/18. |
2018-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/06/18. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |