LA HB393 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective date: 01/01/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the elimination of contents coverage on residential properties following a declared disaster

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the elimination of contents coverage on residential properties following a declared disaster

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 393 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#679) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#409) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 393 FINAL PASSAGE (#74) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14HouseEffective date: 01/01/18.
2017-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 219.
2017-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2017-06-05SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-02HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2017-05-26HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/02/17.
2017-05-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-05-23SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-05-15SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-05-11SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-10SenateReported with amendments.
2017-05-02SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-04-27HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-04-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/27/17.
2017-04-20HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB393&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030612
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034180
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036652
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047747
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1051610
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034999
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040248
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041090
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047625
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030671
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1034363
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036792
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040289
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1055510
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036584
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044307

Bill Comments

feedback