LA HB39 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 08/29/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Louisiana Electric Utility Investment Recovery Securitization Act (Item #35)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Louisiana Electric Utility Investment Recovery Securitization Act (Item #35)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on HB 39 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#100) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#78) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Vote on HB 39 FINAL PASSAGE (#23) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseEffective date: 08/29/2020.
2020-07-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 32.
2020-06-25HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-25SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-25HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-24HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-06-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/24/20.
2020-06-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-22SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-18SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-17SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-14SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2020-06-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/11/20.
2020-06-09HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-08HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2020-06-05HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB39&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180028
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180523
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183806
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185899
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180509
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180284
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182629
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182386
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183775
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180029
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180563
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182744
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186222
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181674
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183307

Bill Comments 750

feedback