LA HB39 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a hybrid retirement benefit structure for members of the state retirement systems first hired on or after July 1, 2020 (OR INCREASE APV)
Title
Establishes a hybrid retirement benefit structure for members of the state retirement systems first hired on or after July 1, 2020 (OR INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2018-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2018. |
2018-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |