LA HB39 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-29 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to extraordinary sessions convened by the legislative presiding officers, provides for the procedure and the form of the petition to call such a session and provides relative to the time and duration thereof
Title
Relative to extraordinary sessions convened by the legislative presiding officers, provides for the procedure and the form of the petition to call such a session and provides relative to the time and duration thereof
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-02-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2010. | |
2010-02-18 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-02-18 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB39 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=676388 |