LA HB389 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for naming the supreme court building after Pascal F. Calogero, Jr.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for naming the supreme court building after Pascal F. Calogero, Jr.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#808) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 389 CO-AUTHORS (#807) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 389 FINAL PASSAGE (#292) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-03HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2019-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-14HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB389&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121448
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130135
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141210
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144906
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128937
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129954
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121489
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130312
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134079
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141066
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141068

Bill Comments

feedback