LA HB388 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Used Motor Vehicle Commission to report information collected by salvage pools or salvage disposal sales
Title
Requires the Used Motor Vehicle Commission to report information collected by salvage pools or salvage disposal sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 388 FINAL PASSAGE (#584) (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 388 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 388 FINAL PASSAGE (#303) (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 3 yeas and 33 nays. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/17. |
2017-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/17. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |