LA HB385 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-13 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the homestead exemption and provides for adjustment of the exemption after reappraisal (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Increases the homestead exemption and provides for adjustment of the exemption after reappraisal (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB385 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=741027 |