LA HB380 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates an individual income tax checkoff for the Uninsured Medical Catastrophe Donation and dedicates the monies to the Uninsured Medical Catastrophe Fund (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Creates an individual income tax checkoff for the Uninsured Medical Catastrophe Donation and dedicates the monies to the Uninsured Medical Catastrophe Fund (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Notice removed |
2018-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/18. |
2018-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2018-03-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported favorably (14-0. To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |