LA HB38 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-30 - Effective date: June 30, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to employee contributions in the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System (EN -$960,000 FC LF EX)
Title
Provides relative to employee contributions in the Registrars of Voters Employees' Retirement System (EN -$960,000 FC LF EX)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 38 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#533) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#463) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House Vote on HB 38 FINAL PASSAGE (#132) (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | House | Effective date: June 30, 2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 71. |
2013-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-23 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on May 22, 2013. |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013. |
2013-02-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2013-02-21 | House | Prefiled. |