LA HB38 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to certain rehired retirees (EN DECREASE APV)
Title
Provides relative to certain rehired retirees (EN DECREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 38, FINAL PASSAGE (#1330) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 38, FINAL PASSAGE (#620) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 38, FINAL PASSAGE (#620) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2012-06-04 | Vetoed by the Governor on June 8, 2012. | |
2012-05-29 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-28 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-23 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-22 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-05-02 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-02 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-25 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/2/2012. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. | |
2012-01-27 | Prefiled. |