LA HB379 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-02 - Effective date: 06/02/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-02 - Effective date: 06/02/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of certain treasury funds (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the transfer, deposit, and use of certain treasury funds (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 ADOPT (#1385) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 379 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1386) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 379 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1284) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 AMENDMENT # 4365 BY WALSWORTH HB 379 BY HENRY (#1152) (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 AMENDMENT # 4353 BY ALLAIN HB 379 BY HENRY (#1151) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 379 FINAL PASSAGE (#634) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 379 MOTION TO ADOPT (#1386) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 379 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1284) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 FINAL PASSAGE (#1153) (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 AMENDMENT # 4365 BY WALSWORTH HB 379 BY HENRY (#1152) (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 379 AMENDMENT # 4353 BY ALLAIN HB 379 BY HENRY (#1151) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 379 FINAL PASSAGE (#634) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-02 | House | Effective date: 06/02/2018. |
2018-06-02 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 642. |
2018-05-23 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2018-05-18 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Alario, and Bishop. |
2018-05-17 | House | House conferees appointed: Henry, Foil, and Dustin Miller. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2018-05-17 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-15 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-25 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 04/30/18. |
2018-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-24 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |