LA HB373 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1076.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Becomes HB 1076.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Delta Agriculture Research and Sustainability District
Title
Provides for the Delta Agriculture Research and Sustainability District
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Becomes HB 1076. |
2022-05-05 | House | Reported by substitute (13-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2022-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |