LA HB373 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Pending: Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for calculation of Medicaid per diem rates for certain intermediate care facilities for people with developmental disabilities (EG +$894,496 GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for calculation of Medicaid per diem rates for certain intermediate care facilities for people with developmental disabilities (EG +$894,496 GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#397) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-20HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-09HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-07HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably (9-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback