LA HB373 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 05/10/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to judicial review of certain administrative decisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to judicial review of certain administrative decisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#718) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#261) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseEffective date: 05/10/2018.
2018-05-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 90.
2018-05-08HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-05-03SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-25SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-05SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-04HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/04/18.
2018-03-29HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-28HouseReported with amendments (8-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback