LA HB373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-26 - Effective date: June 30, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Devleopment
Title
Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Devleopment
Sponsors
Rep. Nita Hutter [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 373, FINAL PASSAGE (#635) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 373, FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 373, FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Effective date: June 30, 2010. | |
2010-05-26 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37. | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-07 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-04-06 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-03-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 6, 2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-12 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2010. | |
2010-03-12 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-12 | Prefiled. |