LA HB372 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Effective date: 05/30/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Occupational Board Compliance Act (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Occupational Board Compliance Act (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 372 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1364) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 372 FINAL PASSAGE (#1308) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 372 FINAL PASSAGE (#342) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30HouseEffective date: 05/30/2018.
2018-05-30HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 623.
2018-05-23HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-18HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-18HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-17HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/18/18.
2018-05-17HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-17SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-17SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2018-05-15SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2018-05-15SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-14SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2018-05-11SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-10SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-12SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2018-04-11SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-10HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18.
2018-04-04HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-03HouseReported with amendments (14-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2018-03-01HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
2018-03-01HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB372&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071418
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082520
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099392
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103393
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1081156
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082347
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094835
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095587
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096349
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098460
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099022
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099264
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1071454
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082666
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094632
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1094874
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1103887
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107968
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1085024
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098807

Bill Comments

feedback