LA HB372 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
Pending: Senate Judiciary A Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to notaries and notary examinations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to notaries and notary examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - House Vote on HB 372 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2015-04-28SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2015-04-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2015-04-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 4/28/2015.
2015-04-22HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2015-04-21HouseReported with amendments (7-5).
2015-04-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2015-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2015-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback