LA HB37 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for additional court costs for the Lockport mayor's court (EN +$25,700 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for additional court costs for the Lockport mayor's court (EN +$25,700 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#1177) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 37, FINAL PASSAGE (#285) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-25 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 238. | |
2012-05-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-21 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-21 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-16 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-15 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-10 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2012-04-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-09 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/9/2012. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported favorably (15-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-01-30 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/30/2012. | |
2012-01-27 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-01-27 | Prefiled. |