LA HB369 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Chapter 9 of the La. Commercial Laws
Title
Provides relative to Chapter 9 of the La. Commercial Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 369, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1029) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 369, FINAL PASSAGE (#965) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 369, FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 369, FINAL PASSAGE (#965) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - House Vote on HB 369, FINAL PASSAGE (#155) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Effective date: July 1, 2013. | |
2012-06-01 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 450. | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for concurrence on 5/22/2012. | |
2012-05-15 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-04-03 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2012-04-03 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/3/2012. | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-03-26 | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-28 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-02-28 | Prefiled. |