LA HB361 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to supported decisionmaking agreements as a less restrictive means to interdiction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to supported decisionmaking agreements as a less restrictive means to interdiction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 361 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#680) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361 FINAL PASSAGE (#480) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 361 HB 361 BY DAVIS (#346) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2020.
2020-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 258.
2020-06-03HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-28SenateThe amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (12-0-1).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB361&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161930
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173968
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175489
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178579
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182333
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174786
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174868
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176213
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177821
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178318
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161949
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1174076
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175657
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176348
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186066
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177196

Bill Comments

feedback