LA HB361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides penalties for persons operating early learning centers without a valid license (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides penalties for persons operating early learning centers without a valid license (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 361 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1131) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361 FINAL PASSAGE (#974) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 361 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361 FINAL PASSAGE (#974) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Vote on HB 361 FINAL PASSAGE (#498) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 659. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-20 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |