LA HB360 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the alignment of the Louisiana National Guard Code of Conduct with the United States Code of Military Justice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the alignment of the Louisiana National Guard Code of Conduct with the United States Code of Military Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 360 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#894) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 360 FINAL PASSAGE (#804) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 360 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-20HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 373.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-28SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB360&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121363
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130597
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134798
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142108
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144524
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130884
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139401
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1140546
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141463
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141963
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1121408
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130722
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134820
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1146426
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134745
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141061

Bill Comments

feedback