LA HB360 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Becomes Act No. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Becomes Act No. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Specifies that the exemption from ad valorem taxation on public property shall not apply to land or property owned by another state or a political subdivision of another state (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Specifies that the exemption from ad valorem taxation on public property shall not apply to land or property owned by another state or a political subdivision of another state (EN INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 360 FINAL PASSAGE (#959) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 360 FINAL PASSAGE (#544) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House Vote on HB 360 FINAL PASSAGE (#544) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Becomes Act No. 470. |
2015-06-10 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-09 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-08 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2015-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2015-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/27/2015. |
2015-05-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-19 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0-1). |
2015-05-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2015-04-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |