LA HB36 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to temporary restraining orders and protective orders in domestic abuse cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to temporary restraining orders and protective orders in domestic abuse cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 36 FINAL PASSAGE (#98) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-22SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-21SenateReported favorably.
2019-05-02SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-04-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
2019-04-25HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-24HouseReported with amendments (8-0-1).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-03-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
2019-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback