LA HB358 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the deductibility of federal income taxes paid for purposes of calculating state individual income tax liability (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Title
Eliminates the deductibility of federal income taxes paid for purposes of calculating state individual income tax liability (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Notice removed |
2017-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/17. |
2017-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-24 | House | Notice removed |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/17. |
2017-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/17. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |