LA HB357 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-31 - Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 20, Senate amendments concurred in.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a proposition election to authorize sports wagering in Louisiana (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a proposition election to authorize sports wagering in Louisiana (EG SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 357 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#679) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#558) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 357 AMENDMENT # 2243 BY HENRY HB 357 BY MAGEE (#557) (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 357 FINAL PASSAGE (#386) (Y: 73 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 20, Senate amendments concurred in.
2020-05-29HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
2020-05-29HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-05-29SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-05-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-05-27SenateReported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-05-25SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-05-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 23. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-15HouseReported with amendments (10-0).
2020-03-09HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=20rs&b=HB357&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161824
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172381
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171012
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172351
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176125
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176697
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177595
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178174
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1178317
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1161854
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1171807
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1172520
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1173417
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1176352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1175571
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1177600

Bill Comments

feedback