LA HB356 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the subject matter jurisdiction of certain courts
Title
Provides relative to the subject matter jurisdiction of certain courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - House Vote on HB 356 FINAL PASSAGE (#314) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2020-05-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2020-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |