LA HB354 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the renaming of road lighting districts and the allocation of funding
Title
Provides for the renaming of road lighting districts and the allocation of funding
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 354 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1540) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#1109) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#1109) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#299) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2024. |
2024-06-11 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 610. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |