LA HB354 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to the dedication of proceeds of the tax levied on motor fuels (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

(Constitutional Amendment) Provides relative to the dedication of proceeds of the tax levied on motor fuels (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 354 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#922) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#852) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#485) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 354 FINAL PASSAGE (#475) (Y: 54 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 354 AMENDMENT # 3410 BY JACKSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#474) (Y: 33 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HouseEffective date: See Act.
2017-06-30HouseBecomes Act No. 429.
2017-06-12HouseTaken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
2017-06-08SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2017-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2017-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
2017-06-08HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/17.
2017-06-07HouseNotice given.
2017-06-07HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-06-06HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/07/17.
2017-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2017-06-05SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-06-05SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2017-06-05SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-06-05SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted.
2017-06-05SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2017-06-02SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2017-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2017-06-01SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-06-01SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2017-05-31SenateReported with amendments.
2017-05-30SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2017-05-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-25HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-25HouseRules suspended.
2017-05-25HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2017-05-25HouseRules suspended.
2017-05-25HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 31. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
2017-05-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/25/17.
2017-05-23HouseRead by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-22HouseReported with amendments (7-0-1).
2017-05-16HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2017-05-15HouseReported with amendments (24-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB354&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030550
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041622
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043853
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050258
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1053051
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041290
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041502
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043721
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045320
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045253
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045258
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046330
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046886
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048883
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1047508
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049158
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1049381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050225
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1030555
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1036406
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041816
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042434
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1043898
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044085
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1046588
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1050616
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1055785
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045263
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1045325
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1048906

Bill Comments

feedback