LA HB354 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a public servant to accept admission, lodging, and transportation to and from certain events while serving as director of a national or regional nonprofit professional public procurement association
Title
Allows a public servant to accept admission, lodging, and transportation to and from certain events while serving as director of a national or regional nonprofit professional public procurement association
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-02 | House | Prefiled. |