LA HB354 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the quarterly payment of ad valorem taxes for Calcasieu Parish (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Title
Authorizes the quarterly payment of ad valorem taxes for Calcasieu Parish (OR INCREASE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |