LA HB35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the jurisdictional limits of the City Court of Lake Charles

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the jurisdictional limits of the City Court of Lake Charles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 35 FINAL PASSAGE (#328) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-06HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably (16-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-03-01HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2019.
2019-02-27HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
2019-02-27HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback