LA HB35 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the DOTD in the matter of "James J. Mire, et al v. Shonna M. Orgeron, et al"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the DOTD in the matter of "James J. Mire, et al v. Shonna M. Orgeron, et al"
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Brown [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-01-29 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/29/2016. |
2016-01-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2016-01-26 | House | Prefiled. |